Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
American Savings of Florida, F.S.B.
Florida, Miami-Dade, Miami
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
American Savings of Florida, F.S.B. - info
Bank class (SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
Established 1950
FDIC number 30473
City Miami
County Miami-Dade
State Florida
Financial data:

Total assets: $3,284,425,000
Total deposits: $2,349,400,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 30473
FDIC's unique number: 43307
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 177470
Report Date: 1995-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-18

History:

1950-08-16 Institution established. Original name: American Savings And Loan Association Of Florida.
1981-08-31 Acquired Key Biscayne Savings And Loan Association in Key Biscayne, Florida.
1988-04-30 Acquired Centerbanc Savings Association in Saint Petersburg, Florida.
1991-05-14 Changed name to American Savings Of Florida, F.S.B. .
1991-05-14 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank of Florida in Jacksonville, Florida.
1996-06-01 Acquired Society First Federal Savings Bank in Fort Myers, Florida.
1996-11-26 Acquired Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hollywood, Florida.
1997-06-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Virginia in Roanoke County, Virginia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union Bank Of Connecticut in Stamford, Connecticut.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Maryland in Rockville, Maryland.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Washington, D.c. in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Tennessee in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

American Savings of Florida, F.S.B. from Florida, Miami-Dade, Miami has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with American Savings of Florida, F.S.B., we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and American Savings of Florida, F.S.B. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
  World Places
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: