Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
Attleboro Pawtucket Savings Bank
Massachusetts, Bristol, Attleboro
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
Attleboro Pawtucket Savings Bank - info
Bank class (SB) Savings banks, state charter
Established 1860
FDIC number 90257
City Attleboro
County Bristol
State Massachusetts
Financial data:

Total assets: $632,450,000
Total deposits: $567,733,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 90257
FDIC's unique number: 17847
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 465403
Report Date: 1992-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1992-08-26

History:

1860-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Attleboro Savings Bank.
1985-11-27 Changed name to Attleborough Savings Bank .
1985-11-27 Became FDIC insured.
1987-11-02 Acquired Pawtucket Institution For Savings in Pawtucket, Rhode Island.
1987-11-02 Changed name to Attleboro Pawtucket Savings Bank .
1987-11-02 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1992-08-21 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New Bedford Institution for Savings in New Bedford, Massachusetts.
1995-01-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet Bank of Massachusetts, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1996-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Springfield, Massachusetts.
1997-11-14 Moved bank headquarters from Boston, Massachusetts to Providence, Rhode Island.
1997-11-14 Acquired Fleet Bank in Albany, New York.
2000-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-04-03 Acquired Bank Of Boston - Florida, National Association in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-04-03 Acquired Fleet Trust And Investment Services Company, National Association in Stuart, Florida.
2000-04-03 Acquired Fleet Bank, F.S.B. in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-05-01 Acquired Fleet Bank-nh in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Attleboro Pawtucket Savings Bank from Massachusetts, Bristol, Attleboro has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with Attleboro Pawtucket Savings Bank, we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and Attleboro Pawtucket Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
  World Places
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: