Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
Citibank Texas, National Association
Texas, Dallas, Dallas
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
Citibank Texas, National Association - info
Bank class (N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
Established 1988
FDIC number 32623
Web Address
City Dallas
County Dallas
State Texas
Financial data:

Total assets: $6,244,877,000
Total deposits: $4,936,241,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 32623
FDIC's unique number: 45457
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1363270
Report Date: 2006-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24561
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-09

History:

1988-10-14 Institution established. Original name: Olney Savings And Loan Association.
1988-10-31 Acquired Olney Savings Association in Olney, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association in Pampa, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Amarillo, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired San Angelo Savings Association in San Angelo, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Odessa Savings Association in Odessa, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Southwest Savings And Loan Association in Abilene, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Banc Home Savings Association in Midland, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Southern Savings And Loan Association in Brownwood, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Heart O Texas Savings Association in San Saba, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Shamrock Federal Savings Bank in Shamrock, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Petroplex Savings Association in Midland, Texas.
1989-12-31 Changed name to Amwest Savings Association .
1994-03-14 Moved bank headquarters from Olney, Texas to Bryan, Texas.
1994-07-01 Changed name to First American Bank, S.S.B. .
1994-07-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1994-07-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1996-07-25 Changed name to First American Bank Texas, SSB .
1998-04-17 Acquired Austin National Bank in Austin, Texas.
2000-03-01 Acquired The Burkburnett Bank in Burkburnett, Texas.
2000-08-18 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2000-09-01 Acquired First American Bank SSB in Bryan, Texas.
2000-09-01 Changed name to First American Bank, SSB .
2003-12-11 Acquired Security Bank National Association in Garland, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed name to Citibank Texas, National Association .
2005-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Bryan, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2005-03-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-03-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Citibank Texas, National Association from Texas, Dallas, Dallas has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with Citibank Texas, National Association, we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and Citibank Texas, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: