Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
Independence Bank Waukesha (N.A.)
Wisconsin, Waukesha, Waukesha
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
Independence Bank Waukesha (N.A.) - info
Bank class (N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
Established 1855
FDIC number 5330
City Waukesha
County Waukesha
State Wisconsin
Financial data:

Total assets: $224,739,000
Total deposits: $172,784,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 5330
FDIC's unique number: 3595
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Milwaukee

Federal Reserve ID Number: 288442
Report Date: 1985-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 1086
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-13

History:

1855-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Waukesha.
1981-03-16 Changed name to Independence Bank Waukesha .
1985-05-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Marine Bank West in Delafield, Wisconsin.
1987-02-28 Acquired Independence Trust Company in Waukesha, Wisconsin.
1988-06-13 Changed name to Bank One, Waukesha .
1989-11-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Milwaukee, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
1996-12-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Independence Bank Waukesha (N.A.) from Wisconsin, Waukesha, Waukesha has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with Independence Bank Waukesha (N.A.), we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and Independence Bank Waukesha (N.A.) will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
  World Places
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: