Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
Jersey Shore State Bank
Pennsylvania, Lycoming, Jersey Shore
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
Status - active

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
Jersey Shore State Bank - info
Ownership:

Bank Holding Company: Penns Woods Bancorp, Inc.

Bank class (NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
Established 1934
FDIC number 14359
Web Address
City Jersey Shore
County Lycoming
State Pennsylvania
Financial data:

Total assets: $734,939,000
Total deposits: $572,556,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $572,556,000
Equity capital: $61,147,000

Net income: $5,790,000

Return on Assets: 1.65
Return on Equity: 20.3
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 14359
FDIC's unique number: 8973
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 732918
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 14
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

History:

1934-05-12 Institution established. Original name: Jersey Shore State Bank.
1995-04-07 Acquired Lock Haven Savings Bank in Lock Haven, Pennsylvania.
1999-01-11 Acquired The First National Bank Of Spring Mills in Spring Mills, Pennsylvania.

Jersey Shore State Bank from Pennsylvania, Lycoming, Jersey Shore has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with Jersey Shore State Bank, we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and Jersey Shore State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
Branches
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: