Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
Maxim Bank
Texas, Galveston, Dickinson
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
Maxim Bank - info
Bank class (NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
Established 1906
FDIC number 9017
Web Address
City Dickinson
County Galveston
State Texas
Financial data:

Total assets: $312,018,000
Total deposits: $242,035,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 9017
FDIC's unique number: 5759
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 576158
Report Date: 2003-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2003-10-31

History:

1906-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens State Bank Of Dickinson, Texas.
1990-06-28 Acquired Bacliff Bank, National Association in Bacliff, Texas.
2001-05-11 Acquired League City Bank & Trust in League City, Texas.
2001-05-11 Changed name to Maxim Bank .
2003-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southwest Bank of Texas National Association in Houston, Texas.
2004-01-31 Acquired Lone Star Bank in Dallas, Texas.
2004-10-01 Acquired Klein Bank in Spring, Texas.
2005-03-07 Changed name to Amegy Bank National Association .
2007-09-05 Acquired Intercontinental National Bank in San Antonio, Texas.

Maxim Bank from Texas, Galveston, Dickinson has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with Maxim Bank, we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and Maxim Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
  World Places
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: