Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
Southern National Bank of Broward County
Florida, Broward, Pompano Beach
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
Southern National Bank of Broward County - info
Bank class (N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
Established 1974
FDIC number 21487
City Pompano Beach
County Broward
State Florida
Financial data:

Total assets: $27,094,000
Total deposits: $23,272,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 21487
FDIC's unique number: 14860
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 311733
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 20616
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

History:

1974-03-20 Institution established. Original name: Southern National Bank Of Broward County.
1980-10-01 Changed name to Southern Bank Of Broward County .
1985-03-22 Changed name to Southern National Bank Of Broward County .
1986-12-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Florida National Bank in Jacksonville, Florida.
1990-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank of Florida in Jacksonville, Florida.
1991-08-02 Acquired Florida Federal Savings, F.S.B. in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1991-09-19 Acquired Southeast Bank, National Association in Miami, Florida.
1991-09-19 Acquired Southeast Bank Of West Florida in Pensacola, Florida.
1991-09-20 Acquired American Pioneer Federal Savings Bank in Daytona Beach, Florida.
1992-03-27 Acquired Flagler Federal Savings And Loan Association in Miami, Florida.
1992-04-10 Acquired Security First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Daytona Beach, Florida.
1993-07-22 Acquired Meritor Savings Bank, F.A. in Winter Haven, Florida.
1993-12-31 Acquired The Enterprise Bank, National Association in Winter Park, Florida.
1994-04-08 Acquired Jacksonville Federal Savings Association in Jacksonville, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
1994-08-01 Acquired Bancflorida, A Federal Savings Bank in Naples, Florida.
1994-08-19 Acquired Hollywood Federal Savings Bank in Hollywood, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-04-01 Acquired First Florida Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Miami, Florida.
1995-06-01 Acquired Coral Gables Federal Savings And Loan Association in Coral Gables, Florida.
1995-07-01 Acquired American Savings Of Florida, F.S.B. in Miami, Florida.
1996-06-01 Acquired Society First Federal Savings Bank in Fort Myers, Florida.
1996-11-26 Acquired Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hollywood, Florida.
1997-06-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Virginia in Roanoke County, Virginia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union Bank Of Connecticut in Stamford, Connecticut.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Maryland in Rockville, Maryland.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Washington, D.c. in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Tennessee in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Southern National Bank of Broward County from Florida, Broward, Pompano Beach has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with Southern National Bank of Broward County, we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and Southern National Bank of Broward County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: