Home * US Banks
Find and Rate US Banks.
United Missouri Bank South
Missouri, Jackson, Kansas City
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
Status - inactive

not rated yet
Rating - 0.00
Voters (0)
Comments (0) Rate & Review
United Missouri Bank South - info
Bank class (NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
Established 1957
FDIC number 17788
City Kansas City
County Jackson
State Missouri
Financial data:

Total assets: $119,314,000
Total deposits: $96,422,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Other info:

FDIC Certificate Number: 17788
FDIC's unique number: 11739
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 702452
Report Date: 1990-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-04-23

History:

1957-08-01 Institution established. Original name: Wornall Bank.
1973-04-20 Changed name to United Missouri Bank South .
1991-03-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Missouri Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1991-06-03 Acquired United Missouri Bank Northland in Kansas City, Missouri.
1991-06-03 Acquired United Missouri Bank Of Clay County, National Association in Liberty, Missouri.
1994-10-01 Changed name to Umb Bank, National Association .
1997-04-26 Acquired Umb Bank Kansas, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1999-07-31 Acquired Umb Bank, Northwest in St. Joseph, Missouri.
1999-08-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of UMB Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1999-09-11 Acquired Umb Bank, Warrensburg in Warrensburg, Missouri.
1999-09-11 Acquired Umb Bank, Boonville in Boonville, Missouri.
1999-09-11 Acquired Umb Bank, Jefferson City in Jefferson City, Missouri.
1999-09-25 Acquired Umb Bank, Northeast in Monroe City, Missouri.
1999-09-25 Acquired Umb First State Bank Of Morrisonville in Morrisonville, Illinois.
1999-09-25 Acquired Umb Bank Of St. Louis, National Association in St. Louis, Missouri.
2000-03-04 Acquired Charter National Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2000-03-04 Acquired Umb Oklahoma Bank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2004-08-01 Acquired Umb U.s.a., National Association in Falls City, Nebraska.
2004-12-04 Acquired Umb Bank Omaha, National Association in Omaha, Nebraska.
2007-12-08 Acquired Umb Bank, Warsaw, National Association in Warsaw, Missouri.

United Missouri Bank South from Missouri, Jackson, Kansas City has not been rated yet. At this time there are no reviews nor comments on this bank.

If you are familiar with United Missouri Bank South, we encourage you to rate and comment. Your opinion is very important to other people and United Missouri Bank South will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Ratings:
Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?
Rate & Review
   LandOfFree - Canada
  MP Candidates
  Charities
  Companies
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Patents
   LandOfFree - World
  Scientific Papers
  World Places
   LandOfFree - United States
  Employee Salary Disclosure
  Companies
  Patents
  Banks
  Counties
Search
ZIP code (12345) [?]:
Name [?]: