Abbeville Building & Loan (A State-Chartered Savings Bank)

Louisiana – Vermilion – Abbeville

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

30332

1890

FDIC Certificate Number: 30332
FDIC's unique number: 43166
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baton Rouge

Federal Reserve ID Number: 114774
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1890-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Abbeville Building And Loan Association.
1993-04-01 Changed name to Abbeville Building & Loan .
1993-04-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1993-04-01 Changed organization type to Mutual Savings Bank.

Total assets: $41,863,000
Total deposits: $26,913,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $26,913,000
Equity capital: $10,904,000

Net income: $340,000

Return on Assets: 1.65
Return on Equity: 6.33
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Abbeville Building & Loan (A State-Chartered Savings Bank) does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Abbeville Building & Loan (A State-Chartered Savings Bank), we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Abbeville Building & Loan (A State-Chartered Savings Bank) will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-246

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.