Allied Bank-Interstate 10

Texas – Harris – Houston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21934

1975

FDIC Certificate Number: 21934
FDIC's unique number: 15201
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Houston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 217853
Report Date: 1987-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1975-02-28 Institution established. Original name: Interstate Bank.
1982-01-01 Changed name to Allied Bank, Interstate 10 .
1982-01-15 Changed name to Allied Bank-interstate 10 .
1988-02-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Interstate Bank of Texas, National Association in Houston, Texas.
1988-04-20 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1988-09-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Atascocita in Harris County, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Marble Falls in Marble Falls, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Angleton, National Association in Angleton, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of North San Antonio in San Antonio, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Beaumont, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Fort Bend in Missouri City, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Conroe in Conroe, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Port Arthur in Port Arthur, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Rockport in Rockport, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of North Austin in Austin, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of South Austin in Austin, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1988-11-14 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Northwest San Antonio, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Mesquite, National Association in Mesquite, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Dallas in Dallas, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of North Richland Hills, National Association in North Richland Hills, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Bedford in Bedford, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Oak Cliff in Dallas, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Marshall in Marshall, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Irving in Irving, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Longview in Longview, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Waxahachie, National Association in Waxahachie, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Dallas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Plano, National Association in Plano, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Brookhollow in Dallas, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Cedar Hill, National Association in Cedar Hill, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank North Central, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Fort Worth in Fort Worth, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Keller, National Association in Keller, Texas.
1988-12-12 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Arlington in Arlington, Texas.
1993-04-16 Acquired First Interstate Bank Of Jacksonville in Jacksonville, Texas.
1993-08-25 Acquired Tarrant Bank in Fort Worth, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
1994-04-29 Acquired The Bank Of The West in Austin, Texas.
1994-05-31 Acquired Mesquite National Bank in Mesquite, Texas.
1994-06-15 Acquired First Interstate Trust Company Of Texas in Houston, Texas.
1994-12-16 Acquired Park Forest National Bank in Dallas, Texas.
1995-01-09 Acquired Bank Of North Texas, National Association in North Richland Hills, Texas.
1995-07-12 Acquired Texas National Bank in Tomball, Texas.
1996-06-01 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank , National Association .
2000-04-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank Texas, National Association in San Antonio, Texas.
2000-06-24 Acquired Prime Bank in Houston, Texas.
2001-06-28 Acquired Midland Trust Company, National Association in Midland, Texas.
2002-06-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Texas in Decatur, Texas.
2002-06-15 Acquired First State Bank Of Texas in Denton, Texas.
2002-08-24 Acquired The First National Bank Of Amarillo in Amarillo, Texas.
2003-11-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2003-12-06 Acquired Bank Of Grand Junction in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-02-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Francisco, California to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Ohio, National Association in Van Wert, Ohio.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank New Mexico, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Illinois, National Association in Galesburg, Illinois.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank North Dakota, National Association in Fargo, North Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Michigan, National Association in Marquette, Michigan.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Indiana, National Association in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Wisconsin, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Nevada, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $22,812,000
Total deposits: $21,484,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Allied Bank-Interstate 10 does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Allied Bank-Interstate 10, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Allied Bank-Interstate 10 will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-200

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.