Allstate Savings and Loan Association

California – Los Angeles – North Hollywood

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

28403

1929

FDIC Certificate Number: 28403
FDIC's unique number: 41237
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Los Angeles (West)

Federal Reserve ID Number: 0
Report Date: 1977-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1929-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Allstate Savings And Loan Association.
1977-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Allstate Savings and Loan Association in Los Angeles, California.
1980-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sears Savings Bank in Glendale, California.
1987-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to Glendale, California.
1993-11-30 Changed name to Pnc Mortgage Bank, National Association .
1993-11-30 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
1993-11-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-01 Acquired Pnc Bank New York, National Association in Warren, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-31 Acquired Pnc Bank, Ohio, National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
1997-12-31 Acquired Pnc Bank, Kentucky, Inc. in Louisville, Kentucky.
1997-12-31 Acquired P N C Bank, Indiana, Inc. in New Albany, Indiana.
2000-11-30 Acquired Pnc Converted Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-31 Acquired Pnc Advisors, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
2001-09-30 Acquired Hilliard Lyons Trust Company in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-03-19 Acquired United Trust Bank in Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2005-05-13 Acquired Riggs National Trust Company in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Farmers & Mechanics Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Laurel, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The National Bank Of Fredericksburg in Fredericksburg, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Marshall National Bank And Trust Company in Marshall, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Annapolis Banking And Trust Company in Annapolis, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Westminster Union Bank in Westminster, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile County Bank in Elkton, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Southern Maryland Bank in Leonardtown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile-safe Deposit And Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Allstate Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Allstate Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Allstate Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-448

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.