Ambassador Savings and Loan Association

Florida – Broward – Fort Lauderdale

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

32220

1984

FDIC Certificate Number: 32220
FDIC's unique number: 45054
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 537971
Report Date: 1990-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-11-08

1984-06-05 Institution established. Original name: Ambassador Savings And Loan Association.
1990-08-24 Failed, went into receivership, and then became Ambassador Federal Savings and Loan Association in Tamarac, Florida.
1991-06-21 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank of North America in Miami, Florida.
1991-06-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of North America in Fort Lauderdale, Florida.
1991-06-28 Acquired Coral Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Coral Springs, Florida.
1996-10-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankAtlantic, A Federal Savings Bank in Fort Lauderdale, Florida.
2002-03-01 Changed name to Bankatlantic .
2002-03-22 Acquired Community Savings, F. A. in North Palm Beach, Florida.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $184,143,000
Total deposits: $161,964,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Ambassador Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Ambassador Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ambassador Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-175

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.