American State Bank

Texas – Lubbock – Lubbock

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

16701

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 16701
FDIC's unique number: 10824
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock

Federal Reserve ID Number: 822154
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 45
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1948-01-01 Institution established. Original name: American State Bank.
1990-07-13 Acquired American State Bank Of Snyder in Snyder, Texas.
1991-03-29 Acquired Liberty State Bank in Lubbock, Texas.
1994-10-01 Acquired Brownfield State Bank in Brownfield, Texas.
1998-07-31 Acquired Security State Bank in Abilene, Texas.
2005-10-28 Acquired First National Bank In Cisco in Cisco, Texas.

Total assets: $2,765,414,000
Total deposits: $2,195,893,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $2,195,893,000
Equity capital: $269,760,000

Net income: $23,923,000

Return on Assets: 1.75
Return on Equity: 18.62
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: American State Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

American State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with American State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and American State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-30

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.