Anchor Bank, National Association

Minnesota – Ramsey – Saint Paul

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

8868

1923

FDIC Certificate Number: 8868
FDIC's unique number: 5662
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 900454
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 21179

Number of Domestic Offices: 16
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-11-24

1923-05-15 Institution established. Original name: West Saint Paul State Bank.
1984-09-27 Changed name to First Bank Of Minnesota West St. Paul .
1986-10-17 Changed name to First National Bank Of West St. Paul .
1986-10-17 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1996-09-01 Changed name to Anchor Bank, West St. Paul National Association .
2003-02-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2003-02-01 Moved bank headquarters from West St. Paul, Minnesota to West Saint Paul, Minnesota.
2006-12-01 Acquired Anchor Bank Saint Paul in Saint Paul, Minnesota.
2006-12-02 Changed name to Anchor Bank St. Paul, National Association .
2008-01-28 Moved bank headquarters from West Saint Paul, Minnesota to Saint Paul, Minnesota.
2008-11-14 Acquired Anchor Bank Farmington, National Association in Farmington, Minnesota.
2009-11-14 Acquired Anchor Bank Heritage, National Association in North Saint Paul, Minnesota.
2009-11-14 Changed name to Anchor Bank, National Association .
2009-11-14 Acquired Anchor Bank National Association in Wayzata, Minnesota.

Total assets: $1,249,680,000
Total deposits: $1,059,673,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,059,673,000
Equity capital: $115,944,000

Net income: $4,597,000

Return on Assets: 0.73
Return on Equity: 8.11
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Anchor Bancorp, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Anchor Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Anchor Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Anchor Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-425

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.