Ascencia Bank

Kentucky – Jefferson – Louisville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

278

1919

FDIC Certificate Number: 278
FDIC's unique number: 223
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown

Federal Reserve ID Number: 460248
Report Date: 2005-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2006-01-13

1919-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Central Bank.
1986-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from North Pleasureville, Kentucky to Pleasureville, Kentucky.
1986-06-30 Changed name to The Central Bank Of North Pleasureville, Kentucky .
1998-08-01 Moved bank headquarters from Pleasureville, Kentucky to Louisville, Kentucky.
1998-09-11 Changed name to The Central Bank Usa, Inc. .
1999-12-31 Changed name to Usaccess Bank .
2002-08-01 Changed name to Ascencia Bank .
2006-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PBI Bank in Greensburg, Kentucky.
2007-10-01 Acquired Kentucky Trust Bank in Beaver Dam, Kentucky.

Total assets: $367,191,000
Total deposits: $313,996,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Ascencia Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Ascencia Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ascencia Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-26

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.