Ashtabula County Savings and Loan Company

Ohio – Ashtabula – Ashtabula

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29765

1901

FDIC Certificate Number: 29765
FDIC's unique number: 42599
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 0
Report Date: 1978-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1978-03-31

1901-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Ashtabula County Savings And Loan Company.
1978-03-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Cardinal Federal Savings Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
1978-05-31 Acquired Buckeye Savings Association in Forest Park, Ohio.
1988-12-30 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
1988-12-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Nationwide Bank, A FSB in San Francisco, California.
1992-10-01 Acquired Columbia, A Federal Savings And Loan Association in Denver, Colorado.
1994-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Nationwide Bank, FSB in Dallas, Texas.
1996-02-01 Acquired San Francisco Federal Savings And Loan Association in San Francisco, California.
1996-06-03 Acquired Home Federal Savings And Loan Association in San Francisco, California.
1997-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of California Federal Bank, A FSB in Los Angeles, California.
1998-09-11 Acquired Glendale Federal Bank, Federal Savings Bank in Glendale, California.
1998-12-01 Moved bank headquarters from Los Angeles, California to San Francisco, California.
2000-02-11 Changed name to California Federal Bank .
2002-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank , FSB in San Francisco, California.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2006-10-01 Changed name to West, National Association .
2006-10-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2006-10-01 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2006-10-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Ashtabula County Savings and Loan Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Ashtabula County Savings and Loan Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Ashtabula County Savings and Loan Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-95

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.