Atlantic Bank and Trust Company

Georgia – Chatham – Savannah

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8030

1933

FDIC Certificate Number: 8030
FDIC's unique number: 5111
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 371335
Report Date: 1983-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1933-11-06 Institution established. Original name: Atlantic Bank And Trust Company.
1983-08-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of the South, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1983-09-01 Changed name to Bank South, National Association .
1984-07-25 Acquired Bank Of Cumming in Cumming, Georgia.
1984-07-25 Acquired Bank South, Clayton in Forest Park, Georgia.
1985-04-19 Acquired The Bank Of Griffin in Griffin, Georgia.
1987-02-09 Acquired Bank Of Barrow in Winder, Georgia.
1987-11-20 Acquired Heritage Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia.
1987-12-03 Acquired First Bank Of Conyers in Conyers, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Jasper County National Association in Monticello, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Washington County in Tennille, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Fitzgerald in Fitzgerald, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Waycross in Waycross, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Macon in Macon, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Houston County National Association in Perry, Georgia.
1991-12-31 Acquired Bank South, Douglas in Douglas, Georgia.
1993-12-02 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Atlanta in Atlanta, Georgia.
1993-12-02 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Fayette County in Fayetteville, Georgia.
1994-03-18 Acquired The Merchant Bank Of Atlanta in Atlanta, Georgia.
1994-04-07 Acquired The Chattahoochee Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
1994-07-22 Acquired The Citizens Bank in Gainesville, Georgia.
1995-02-17 Acquired Gwinnett Federal Bank, Federal Savings Bank in Lawrenceville, Georgia.
1995-06-28 Changed name to Bank South .
1995-06-28 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
1996-02-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1996-08-13 Acquired Chase Federal Bank, A Federal Savings Bank in Miami, Florida.
1997-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-06-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Vandalia in Vandalia, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southwest Missouri in Carthage, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Kennett in Kennett, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired The Boatmen's National Bank Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Central Illinois in Hillsboro, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Cape Girardeau in Cape Girardeau, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Lebanon in Lebanon, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's First National Bank Of West Plains in West Plains, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Mid-missouri in Columbia, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's River Valley Bank in Lexington, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Marshall in Marshall, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Quincy in Quincy, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of South Central Illinois in Mount Vernon, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Rolla in Rolla, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Pulaski County in Richland, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Coles County in Charleston, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Troy in Troy, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Franklin County in Benton, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Osage Bank in Butler, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Boonville in Boonville, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southern Missouri in Springfield, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Oklahoma in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of Albuquerque, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of South Arkansas in Camden, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Newark in Newark, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Kansas in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1998-01-15 Acquired Sun World, National Association in Santa Teresa, New Mexico.
1998-01-23 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Illinois in Belleville, Illinois.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company, An Oklahoma Trust Company in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1998-03-28 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-05-06 Acquired Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $50,137,000
Total deposits: $40,881,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Atlantic Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Atlantic Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Atlantic Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-309

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.