Bank of Commerce

Louisiana – Rapides – Alexandria

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

26835

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26835
FDIC's unique number: 36061
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport

Federal Reserve ID Number: 218234
Report Date: 1990-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-12-18

1986-11-24 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Commerce.
1990-12-13 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Evangeline Bank and Trust Co. in Ville Platte, Louisiana.
2007-11-06 Changed name to The Evangeline Bank And Trust Company .
2007-11-06 Moved bank headquarters from Alexandria, Louisiana to Ville Platte, Louisiana.

Total assets: $19,650,000
Total deposits: $19,943,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Commerce does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Commerce, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Commerce will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-428

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.