Bank of Enville

Tennessee – Chester – Enville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

9195

1905

FDIC Certificate Number: 9195
FDIC's unique number: 5889
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 134352
Report Date: 1979-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1905-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Enville.
1979-06-16 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.

Total assets: $3,621,000
Total deposits: $3,350,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Enville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Enville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Enville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-382

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.