Bank of Montana Glasgow

Montana – Valley – Glasgow

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

347

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 347
FDIC's unique number: 275
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings

Federal Reserve ID Number: 643751
Report Date: 1992-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-10-01

1917-01-29 Institution established. Original name: First Security Bank Of Glasgow, National Association.
1974-02-14 Changed name to First Security Bank Of Montana, National Association .
1988-06-13 Changed name to First Security Bank Of Montana .
1988-06-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1990-02-23 Changed name to Bank Of Montana Glasgow .
1992-09-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Montana in Great Falls, Montana.
1993-04-24 Acquired Bank Of Montana Butte in Butte, Montana.
1994-09-30 Changed name to Bank Of Montana, National Association .
1994-09-30 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1995-02-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Norwest Bank Montana, National Association in Billings, Montana.
2000-07-28 Changed name to Wells Fargo Bank Montana, National Association .
2003-11-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2003-12-06 Acquired Bank Of Grand Junction in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2004-02-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Francisco, California to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Ohio, National Association in Van Wert, Ohio.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank New Mexico, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Illinois, National Association in Galesburg, Illinois.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank North Dakota, National Association in Fargo, North Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Michigan, National Association in Marquette, Michigan.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Minnesota, National Association in Minneapolis, Minnesota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Indiana, National Association in Fort Wayne, Indiana.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank South Dakota, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Wisconsin, National Association in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Arizona, National Association in Phoenix, Arizona.
2004-02-20 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Nevada, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2004-04-24 Acquired Pacific Northwest Bank in Oak Harbor, Washington.
2005-09-24 Acquired First Community Bank, National Association in Houston, Texas.
2006-06-17 Acquired State Bank Of Rogers in Rogers, Minnesota.
2006-09-23 Acquired Fremont National Bank Of Canon City in Canon City, Colorado.
2006-09-23 Acquired Centennial Bank Of Pueblo in Pueblo, Colorado.
2007-09-22 Acquired Placer Sierra Bank in Auburn, California.
2008-03-15 Acquired Greater Bay Bank, National Association in Palo Alto, California.
2008-10-18 Acquired The Jackson State Bank in Jackson, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Shoshone First Bank in Cody, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired First State Bank Of Pinedale in Pinedale, Wyoming.
2008-10-18 Acquired Sheridan State Bank in Sheridan, Wyoming.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction-downtown, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-01-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Grand Junction, National Association in Grand Junction, Colorado.
2009-02-02 Acquired Wells Fargo Financial Bank in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2009-04-25 Acquired Century Bank, National Association in Texarkana, Texas.
2009-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Bank Southwest, National Association in North Las Vegas, Nevada.
2009-11-07 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Colorado, Interim National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2010-03-20 Acquired Wachovia Bank Of Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $38,965,000
Total deposits: $34,465,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Montana Glasgow does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Montana Glasgow, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Montana Glasgow will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-477

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.