Bank of Monte Vista

Colorado – Rio Grande – Monte Vista

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

15556

1936

FDIC Certificate Number: 15556
FDIC's unique number: 9850
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 461254
Report Date: 2002-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2002-10-21

1936-08-27 Institution established. Original name: Fidelity Bank And Trust.
1971-01-01 Changed name to Bank Of Monte Vista .
1997-01-01 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2002-09-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sunflower Bank, National Association in Salina, Kansas.
2004-07-08 Acquired The Citizens State Bank, Liberal, Kansas in Liberal, Kansas.
2005-04-07 Acquired First National Bank - Colorado in Fowler, Colorado.
2010-01-22 Acquired Bank Of Leeton in Leeton, Missouri as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $75,774,000
Total deposits: $64,065,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Monte Vista does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Monte Vista, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Monte Vista will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-159

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.