Bank of New Haven

Kentucky – Nelson – New Haven

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

276

1905

FDIC Certificate Number: 276
FDIC's unique number: 221
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown

Federal Reserve ID Number: 457949
Report Date: 1982-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1905-06-05 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of New Haven.
1982-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers Bank & Trust Co. in Bardstown, Kentucky.
1989-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from New Haven, Kentucky to Bardstown, Kentucky.
2004-05-25 Changed name to Town & Country Bank And Trust Company .

Total assets: $11,063,000
Total deposits: $9,611,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of New Haven does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of New Haven, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of New Haven will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.