Bank of Picayune

Mississippi – Pearl River – Picayune

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

11427

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 11427
FDIC's unique number: 7297
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 97831
Report Date: 1975-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1904-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Picayune.
1975-06-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Hancock Bank in Gulfport, Mississippi.
1981-11-30 Moved bank headquarters from Picayune, Mississippi to Gulfport, Mississippi.
1985-10-01 Acquired Pascagoula-moss Point Bank in Moss Point, Mississippi.
1990-06-04 Acquired Metropolitan National Bank in Biloxi, Mississippi.
1991-08-09 Acquired Peoples Federal Savings Association in Bay St. Louis, Mississippi.
2001-09-24 Acquired The Lamar Bank in Purvis, Mississippi.
2009-12-18 Acquired Peoples First Community Bank in Panama City, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01 Acquired Hancock Bank Of Florida in Tallahassee, Florida.

Total assets: $17,190,000
Total deposits: $15,312,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Picayune does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Picayune, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Picayune will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25287

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.