Bank of Powhatan, N.A.

Virginia – Powhatan – Powhatan

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

35346

2000

FDIC Certificate Number: 35346
FDIC's unique number: 78807
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2897503
Report Date: 2007-03-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23943
The date of the last data update: 2007-07-11

2000-03-20 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Powhatan, N.A.
2004-02-10 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2007-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Transcommunity Bank, National Association in Goochland, Virginia.
2008-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Essex in Tappahannock, Virginia.
2008-11-21 Acquired The Community Bank in Loganville, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-01-30 Acquired Suburban Federal Savings Bank in Crofton, Maryland as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-04-20 Changed name to Essex Bank .

Total assets: $68,862,000
Total deposits: $60,862,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Powhatan, N.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Powhatan, N.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Powhatan, N.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-437

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.