Bank of Riverside, Missouri

Missouri – Platte – Kansas City

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19390

1954

FDIC Certificate Number: 19390
FDIC's unique number: 13196
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 654654
Report Date: 1993-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-02-08

1954-12-21 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Riverside, Missouri.
1994-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Farmers Exchange Bank in Parkville, Missouri.
2002-11-01 Changed name to Park Bank .
2007-11-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Brotherhood Bank & Trust in Kansas City, Kansas.

Total assets: $9,053,000
Total deposits: $8,330,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Riverside, Missouri does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Riverside, Missouri, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Riverside, Missouri will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.