Bank of Sugar Grove

Illinois – Kane – Sugar Grove

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

21930

1975

FDIC Certificate Number: 21930
FDIC's unique number: 15198
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago

Federal Reserve ID Number: 594442
Report Date: 1999-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-03-21

1975-02-21 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Sugar Grove.
1995-06-30 Reorganized.
2000-02-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Old Second National Bank of Aurora in Aurora, Illinois.
2000-06-29 Moved bank headquarters from Sugar Grove, Illinois to Aurora, Illinois.
2007-07-01 Changed name to Old Second National Bank .
2007-07-01 Acquired Old Second Bank-yorkville in Yorkville, Illinois.
2007-07-01 Acquired Old Second Bank-kane County in Elburn, Illinois.
2008-02-09 Acquired Heritage Bank in Frankfort, Illinois.

Total assets: $44,920,000
Total deposits: $38,537,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Sugar Grove does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Sugar Grove, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Sugar Grove will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-197

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.