Bank of Water Valley

Mississippi – Yalobusha – Water Valley

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

12205

1882

FDIC Certificate Number: 12205
FDIC's unique number: 7753
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 937647
Report Date: 1987-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-27

1882-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Water Valley.
1988-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Peoples Bank and Trust Company in Tupelo, Mississippi.
1994-12-31 Acquired New South Bank in Batesville, Mississippi.
1999-03-26 Acquired Inter-city Federal Savings Bank in Louisville, Mississippi.
2005-01-01 Acquired Heritage Bank in Decatur, Alabama.
2005-02-01 Changed name to Renasant Bank .
2005-03-31 Acquired Renasant Bank Of Tennessee in Germantown, Tennessee.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital Bank & Trust Company in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-07-23 Acquired Crescent Bank And Trust Company in Jasper, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-02-04 Acquired American Trust Bank in Roswell, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $50,737,000
Total deposits: $46,038,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Water Valley does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Water Valley, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Water Valley will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-398

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.