Bank of Williston

South Carolina – Barnwell – Williston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

11545

1905

FDIC Certificate Number: 11545
FDIC's unique number: 7376
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Sc

Federal Reserve ID Number: 595524
Report Date: 1981-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1905-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Bank Of Williston.
1982-03-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Citizens and Southern National Bank of S.C. in Charleston, South Carolina.
1982-12-31 Acquired Carolina National Bank in Easley, South Carolina.
1983-06-09 Acquired Bank Of Fort Mill in Fort Mill, South Carolina.
1983-08-27 Acquired The Farmers & Merchants Bank in Aiken, South Carolina.
1986-10-31 Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank in Walterboro, South Carolina.
1986-12-01 Acquired Andrews Bank & Trust Company in Andrews, South Carolina.
1992-06-15 Changed name to Nationsbank Of South Carolina, National Association .
1992-06-15 Moved bank headquarters from Charleston, South Carolina to Columbia, South Carolina.
1992-06-15 Acquired Ncnb National Bank Of South Carolina in Columbia, South Carolina.
1992-06-15 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company , National Association in Columbia, South Carolina.
1994-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of NationsBank of South Carolina, National Association in Rock Hill, South Carolina.
1995-01-03 Changed name to Nationsbank, National Association .
1995-01-03 Moved bank headquarters from Columbia, South Carolina to Charlotte, North Carolina.
1995-01-03 Acquired Nationsbank Of North Carolina, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1995-09-29 Changed name to Nationsbank, National Association .
1995-09-29 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Richmond, Virginia.
1996-04-15 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company, National Association in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-06-01 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1997-06-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Vandalia in Vandalia, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southwest Missouri in Carthage, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Kennett in Kennett, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired The Boatmen's National Bank Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Central Illinois in Hillsboro, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Cape Girardeau in Cape Girardeau, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Lebanon in Lebanon, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's First National Bank Of West Plains in West Plains, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Mid-missouri in Columbia, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's River Valley Bank in Lexington, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Marshall in Marshall, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Quincy in Quincy, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of South Central Illinois in Mount Vernon, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Rolla in Rolla, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Pulaski County in Richland, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Coles County in Charleston, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Troy in Troy, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Franklin County in Benton, Illinois.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's Osage Bank in Butler, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Boonville in Boonville, Missouri.
1997-06-13 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Of Southern Missouri in Springfield, Missouri.
1997-07-11 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Oklahoma in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of Albuquerque, National Association in Albuquerque, New Mexico.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of South Arkansas in Camden, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Newark in Newark, Arkansas.
1997-08-15 Acquired Boatmen's Bank Iowa, National Association in Des Moines, Iowa.
1997-09-19 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Kansas in Prairie Village, Kansas.
1998-01-15 Acquired Sun World, National Association in Santa Teresa, New Mexico.
1998-01-23 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Illinois in Belleville, Illinois.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of St. Louis in St. Louis, Missouri.
1998-03-13 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company, An Oklahoma Trust Company in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
1998-03-28 Acquired Boatmen's Trust Company Of Arkansas in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-05-06 Acquired Nationsbank Of Texas, National Association in Dallas, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Sunwest Bank Of El Paso, National Association in El Paso, Texas.
1998-07-09 Acquired Boatmen's National Bank Of Austin in Austin, Texas.
1998-08-06 Acquired Nationsbank, National Association in Brunswick, Georgia.
1998-10-08 Acquired Barnett Bank, National Association in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-10-08 Acquired Community Bank Of The Islands in Sanibel, Florida.
1998-11-12 Acquired Nationsbank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1999-04-08 Acquired Bank Of America Texas, National Association in Irving, Texas.
1999-04-08 Reorganized.
1999-07-05 Changed name to Bank Of America, National Association .
1999-07-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1999-12-01 Acquired Bank Of America Utah, National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2001-05-31 Acquired Nationsbank Trust Company Of New York in New York, New York.
2005-06-13 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $9,592,000
Total deposits: $8,471,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank of Williston does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank of Williston, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank of Williston will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.