Bank One, Utah, National Association

Utah – Salt Lake – Salt Lake City

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

16703

1948

FDIC Certificate Number: 16703
FDIC's unique number: 10826
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Salt Lake City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 294872
Report Date: 2001-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18785
The date of the last data update: 2001-12-12

1948-06-01 Institution established. Original name: Valley Bank And Trust Company.
1982-08-09 Moved bank headquarters from South Salt Lake, Utah to Salt Lake City, Utah.
1983-07-01 Acquired Utah Valley Bank in Orem, Utah.
1985-05-01 Acquired Weber Valley Bank in Ogden, Utah.
1985-05-01 Acquired Bountiful Valley Bank in Bountiful, Utah.
1988-01-01 Acquired Silver King State Bank in Park City, Utah.
1992-01-01 Changed name to Valley Bank And Trust Company, National Association .
1992-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1993-04-01 Acquired Valley Central Bank in Richfield, Utah.
1993-04-01 Changed name to Bank One, Utah, National Association .
1994-05-02 Acquired Capital City Bank in South Salt Lake, Utah.
2001-11-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank One, National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2002-06-21 Acquired Bank One, Michigan in Detroit, Michigan.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Wisconsin in Milwaukee, Wisconsin.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2002-08-22 Acquired Bank One, Colorado, National Association in Denver, Colorado.
2002-11-08 Acquired Bank One, Illinois, National Association in Springfield, Illinois.
2002-11-08 Acquired American National Bank And Trust Company Of Chicago in Chicago, Illinois.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Oklahoma, National Association in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2003-05-15 Acquired Bank One, Kentucky, National Association in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2006-10-20 Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association in Columbus, Ohio.
2008-08-16 Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association in Los Angeles, California.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank Fsb in Park City, Utah.
2008-09-25 Acquired Washington Mutual Bank in Henderson, Nevada as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $1,265,995,000
Total deposits: $1,065,168,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bank One, Utah, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bank One, Utah, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bank One, Utah, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-31

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.