Bayside Savings Bank

Florida – Gulf – Port Saint Joe

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

57669

2003

FDIC Certificate Number: 57669
FDIC's unique number: 419363
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Pensacola

Federal Reserve ID Number: 3218253
Report Date: 2010-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-02

2003-10-28 Institution established. Original name: Bayside Savings Bank.
2010-07-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Centennial Bank in Conway, Arkansas.
2010-07-30 FDIC closing information for Bayside Savings Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/bayside.html.
2010-07-31 Reorganized.
2010-10-01 Acquired Wakulla Bank in Crawfordville, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-19 Acquired Gulf State Community Bank in Carrabelle, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-11-20 Reorganized.

Total assets: $64,344,000
Total deposits: $52,720,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Bayside Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Bayside Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Bayside Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-194

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.