Beach Bank

Florida – Miami-Dade – Miami Beach

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

35051

2000

FDIC Certificate Number: 35051
FDIC's unique number: 74355
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2907943
Report Date: 2006-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-01-10

2000-05-01 Institution established. Original name: Beach Bank.
2006-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sun American Bank in Boca Raton, Florida.
2007-03-31 Acquired Independent Community Bank in Tequesta, Florida.
2010-03-05 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First-Citizens Bank & Trust Company in Raleigh, North Carolina.
2010-03-05 FDIC closing information for Sun American Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/sunamerican.html.
2011-01-21 Acquired United Western Bank in Denver, Colorado as part of a government assisted transaction.
2011-07-08 Acquired Colorado Capital Bank in Castle Rock, Colorado as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $127,145,000
Total deposits: $116,310,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Beach Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Beach Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Beach Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-476

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.