BNY Mellon, National Association

Pennsylvania – Allegheny – Pittsburgh

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

7946

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 7946
FDIC's unique number: 5080
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 934329
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 6301

Number of Domestic Offices: 20
Number of Foreign Offices: 2
The date of the last data update: 2008-08-27

1869-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Mellon National Bank And Trust Company.
1972-11-22 Changed name to Mellon Bank, N. A. .
1982-09-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Greensburg, Pennsylvania.
1985-01-07 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of New Castle in New Castle, Pennsylvania.
1985-01-07 Changed name to Mellon Bank, National Association .
1991-01-01 Acquired Mellon Bank Psfs, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1991-10-01 Acquired Mellon Bank National Association in Oil City, Pennsylvania.
1991-10-01 Acquired The Commonwealth National Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
1991-10-01 Acquired Mellon Bank National Association in State College, Pennsylvania.
1991-12-31 Acquired United Penn Bank in Wilkes Barre, Pennsylvania.
1992-12-11 Acquired Meritor Savings Bank in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1995-05-19 Acquired Glendale Bank Of Pennsylvania in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1996-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Greensburg, Pennsylvania to Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1996-11-23 Acquired Mellon Psfs National Association in Voorhees Township, New Jersey.
2000-04-01 Acquired Mellon Bank Md National Association in Rockville, Maryland.
2003-09-15 Acquired Mellon Bank Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-01-15 Acquired Mellon Florida Interim National Bank in Miami, Florida.
2008-07-01 Acquired Mellon Trust Of New England, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
2008-07-01 Changed name to Bny Mellon, National Association .
2008-07-01 Acquired Mellon California Interim National Bank, Los Angeles, California in Los Angeles, California.
2008-07-01 Acquired Mellon New York Interim National Bank, Llc in New York, New York.
2008-07-01 Acquired Mellon Washington Interim National Bank, Seattle, Washington in Bellevue, Washington.

Total assets: $11,459,900,000
Total deposits: $8,593,078,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $8,593,078,000
Equity capital: $2,701,189,000

Net income: $63,528,000

Return on Assets: 1.07
Return on Equity: 4.78
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, The

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

BNY Mellon, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with BNY Mellon, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and BNY Mellon, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-380

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.