Brownfield State Bank & Trust Co.

Texas – Terry – Brownfield

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

1177

1905

FDIC Certificate Number: 1177
FDIC's unique number: 807
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock

Federal Reserve ID Number: 46558
Report Date: 1983-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1905-10-02 Institution established. Original name: Brownfield State Bank & Trust Co., Brownfield, Texas.
1972-01-01 Changed name to Brownfield State Bank & Trust Co. .
1984-02-17 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Brownfield State Bank in Brownfield, Texas.
1994-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of American State Bank in Lubbock, Texas.
1998-07-31 Acquired Security State Bank in Abilene, Texas.
2005-10-28 Acquired First National Bank In Cisco in Cisco, Texas.

Total assets: $38,854,000
Total deposits: $37,585,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Brownfield State Bank & Trust Co. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Brownfield State Bank & Trust Co., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Brownfield State Bank & Trust Co. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-103

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.