Cache Bank and Trust

Colorado – Weld – Greeley

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

34328

1996

FDIC Certificate Number: 34328
FDIC's unique number: 57087
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2506328
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1996-10-11 Institution established. Original name: Cache Bank.
2000-10-12 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2000-11-17 Changed name to Cache Bank And Trust .

Total assets: $162,091,000
Total deposits: $147,694,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $147,694,000
Equity capital: $14,108,000

Net income: $285,000

Return on Assets: 0.35
Return on Equity: 4.16
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Cache Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Cache Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Cache Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-458

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.