Central Bank

Iowa – Buena Vista – Storm Lake

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

15555

1879

FDIC Certificate Number: 15555
FDIC's unique number: 9849
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 546544
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 9
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1879-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Commercial Trust & Savings Bank.
2001-12-15 Acquired Central Trust And Savings Bank in Cherokee, Iowa.
2001-12-15 Changed name to Central Bank .
2002-10-28 Acquired Security State Bank in Spirit Lake, Iowa.

Total assets: $426,543,000
Total deposits: $367,597,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $367,597,000
Equity capital: $44,055,000

Net income: $1,840,000

Return on Assets: 0.86
Return on Equity: 8.5
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Commercial Financial Corp

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Central Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Central Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-147

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.