Central Evergreen Federal Savings and Loan Association

Washington – Lewis – Chehalis

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

28404

1922

FDIC Certificate Number: 28404
FDIC's unique number: 41238
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Seattle

Federal Reserve ID Number: 464871
Report Date: 1988-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10

1922-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Central Evergreen Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1982-05-31 Acquired Evergreen Savings Association in Chehalis, Washington.
1989-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sterling Savings Association in Spokane, Washington.
1989-08-09 Moved bank headquarters from Chehalis, Washington to Spokane, Washington.
1998-06-15 Changed name to Sterling Savings Bank .
1998-11-13 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Montana in Hamilton, Montana.
2003-02-28 Acquired Empire Bank in Livingston, Montana.
2004-01-02 Acquired Klamath First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Klamath Falls, Oregon.
2005-07-08 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2005-07-08 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-07-08 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2006-11-30 Acquired Firstbank Northwest in Clarkston, Washington.
2007-02-28 Acquired Sonoma National Bank in Santa Rosa, California.
2010-08-03 Acquired Golf Savings Bank in Mountlake Terrace, Washington.

Total assets: $225,350,000
Total deposits: $216,950,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Central Evergreen Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Central Evergreen Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Central Evergreen Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-455

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.