Centrue Bank

Illinois – La Salle – Streator

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

3744

1874

FDIC Certificate Number: 3744
FDIC's unique number: 2409
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 457547
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 29
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-06-27

1874-08-24 Institution established. Original name: The Union National Bank Of Streator.
1988-12-01 Changed name to Union Bank/streator .
1990-02-03 Acquired Union Bank/triumph in Ottawa, Illinois.
1991-05-01 Acquired Ottawa National Bank in Ottawa, Illinois.
1991-05-01 Changed name to Unionbank .
1997-10-25 Acquired Union Bank/sandwich in Sandwich, Illinois.
2003-03-28 Acquired Unionbank/central in Princeton, Illinois.
2004-03-20 Acquired Union Bank/west in Macomb, Illinois.
2004-03-20 Acquired Unionbank/northwest in Hanover, Illinois.
2004-10-20 Acquired Union Trust Corporation in Streator, Illinois.
2006-11-13 Acquired Centrue Bank in Kankakee, Illinois.
2006-11-13 Changed name to Centrue Bank .
2007-06-22 Acquired Bank 10 in Belton, Missouri.

Total assets: $1,018,961,000
Total deposits: $868,574,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $868,574,000
Equity capital: $70,240,000

Net income: $-5,024,000

Return on Assets: -0.94
Return on Equity: -13.98
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Centrue Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Centrue Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Centrue Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Centrue Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-185

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.