Century Bank-Academy at Hancock

Colorado – El Paso – Colorado Springs

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

23714

1982

FDIC Certificate Number: 23714
FDIC's unique number: 16584
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 719151
Report Date: 1993-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1994-04-18

1982-03-02 Institution established. Original name: Liberty State Bank.
1985-06-20 Changed name to Century Bank-academy At Hancock .
1994-03-25 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Key Bank of Colorado in Fort Collins, Colorado.
1994-12-30 Acquired The Bank Of Greeley in Greeley, Colorado.
1995-07-20 Acquired Omnibank Commerce City in Commerce City, Colorado.
1995-07-20 Acquired Omnibank Southeast in Denver, Colorado.
1995-07-20 Acquired Omnibank Aurora in Aurora, Colorado.
1995-07-20 Acquired Omnibank Parker Road in Aurora, Colorado.
1995-07-20 Acquired Omnibank Iliff in Aurora, Colorado.
1997-01-13 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1997-01-13 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1997-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of KeyBank National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $33,688,000
Total deposits: $31,741,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Century Bank-Academy at Hancock does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Century Bank-Academy at Hancock, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Century Bank-Academy at Hancock will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-480

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.