Chenango Federal Savings and Loan Association

New York – Chenango – Norwich

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29762

1888

FDIC Certificate Number: 29762
FDIC's unique number: 42596
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse

Federal Reserve ID Number: 415079
Report Date: 1984-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10

1888-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Chenango Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1985-01-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Astoria Federal Savings and Loan Association in Long Island City, New York.
1988-01-31 Acquired Oneonta Federal Savings And Loan Association in Oneonta, New York.
1990-11-16 Acquired Whitestone Federal Savings And Loan Association in Whitestone, New York.
1993-11-18 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1995-01-31 Acquired Fidelity New York Fsb in Floral Park, New York.
1997-10-01 Moved bank headquarters from Long Island City, New York to New York City, New York.
1997-10-01 Acquired The Greater New York Savings Bank in New York City, New York.
1998-10-01 Acquired The Long Island Savings Bank, Fsb in Melville, New York.
2007-08-15 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Long Island City, New York.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $26,752,000
Total deposits: $25,772,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Chenango Federal Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Chenango Federal Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Chenango Federal Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-102

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.