Citibank Texas, National Association

Texas – Dallas – Dallas

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

32623

1988

FDIC Certificate Number: 32623
FDIC's unique number: 45457
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Austin

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1363270
Report Date: 2006-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 24561
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-09

1988-10-14 Institution established. Original name: Olney Savings And Loan Association.
1988-10-31 Acquired Olney Savings Association in Olney, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association in Pampa, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Amarillo, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired San Angelo Savings Association in San Angelo, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Odessa Savings Association in Odessa, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Southwest Savings And Loan Association in Abilene, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Banc Home Savings Association in Midland, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Southern Savings And Loan Association in Brownwood, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Heart O Texas Savings Association in San Saba, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Shamrock Federal Savings Bank in Shamrock, Texas.
1988-10-31 Acquired Petroplex Savings Association in Midland, Texas.
1989-12-31 Changed name to Amwest Savings Association .
1994-03-14 Moved bank headquarters from Olney, Texas to Bryan, Texas.
1994-07-01 Changed name to First American Bank, S.S.B. .
1994-07-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
1994-07-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1996-07-25 Changed name to First American Bank Texas, SSB .
1998-04-17 Acquired Austin National Bank in Austin, Texas.
2000-03-01 Acquired The Burkburnett Bank in Burkburnett, Texas.
2000-08-18 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2000-09-01 Acquired First American Bank SSB in Bryan, Texas.
2000-09-01 Changed name to First American Bank, SSB .
2003-12-11 Acquired Security Bank National Association in Garland, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed name to Citibank Texas, National Association .
2005-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Bryan, Texas to Dallas, Texas.
2005-03-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
2005-03-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2005-03-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2006-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank, National Association in Las Vegas, Nevada.
2008-11-23 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2011-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Las Vegas, Nevada to Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2011-07-01 Acquired Citibank , N.A. in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.

Total assets: $6,244,877,000
Total deposits: $4,936,241,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citibank Texas, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citibank Texas, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citibank Texas, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2426

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.