Citizens Bank

Tennessee – DeKalb – Smithville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

19510

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19510
FDIC's unique number: 13310
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Nashville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 864837
Report Date: 1995-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-03-22

1965-10-22 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Bank.
1988-07-07 Acquired Bank Of Ardmore in Ardmore, Tennessee.
1996-03-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First American National Bank in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-01-02 Acquired Communityfirst Bank in Hartsville, Tennessee.
1997-07-01 Acquired First American National Bank Of Kentucky in Bowling Green, Kentucky.
1998-06-01 Acquired Victory Bank And Trust Company in Cordova, Tennessee.
1998-09-01 Acquired Deposit Guaranty National Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
1998-10-01 Acquired The Middle Tennessee Bank in Columbia, Tennessee.
1998-10-01 Acquired Cheatham State Bank in Kingston Springs, Tennessee.
1998-11-20 Acquired Valley Bank in Sweetwater, Tennessee.
1998-11-20 Acquired Pioneer Bank in Chattanooga, Tennessee.
1999-06-30 Acquired Peoples Bank in Dickson, Tennessee.
1999-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of AmSouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2000-03-31 Acquired First American Federal Savings Bank in Dalton, Georgia.
2006-11-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $111,942,000
Total deposits: $102,059,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Citizens Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Citizens Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Citizens Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-456

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.