City Federal Savings Bank

New Jersey – Union – Elizabeth

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

28406

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 28406
FDIC's unique number: 41240
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 588179
Report Date: 1989-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-10-22

1910-01-01 Institution established. Original name: City Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1981-12-31 Acquired Mohawk Savings And Loan Association in Newark, New Jersey.
1982-01-01 Acquired Boca Raton Federal Savings And Loan Association in Boca Raton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
1982-01-31 Acquired First Savings And Loan Association in New Brunswick, New Jersey.
1983-07-31 Acquired Home Federal Savings And Loan Association in Palm Beach, Florida.
1986-01-31 Moved bank headquarters from Elizabeth, New Jersey to Bedminster, New Jersey.
1986-01-31 Changed name to City Federal Savings Bank .
1986-01-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1989-12-08 Failed, went into receivership, and then became City Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Elizabeth, New Jersey.
1990-09-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of City Savings, FSB in Elizabeth, New Jersey.
1991-01-11 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association, New Jersey in Newark, New Jersey.
1991-04-13 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, Princeton in Monmouth Junction, New Jersey.
1991-05-22 Acquired The First National Bank Of Toms River, N.j. in Toms River, New Jersey.
1991-09-27 Acquired Morris Savings Bank in Morristown, New Jersey.
1992-10-02 Acquired The Howard Savings Bank in Newark, New Jersey.
1992-10-02 Acquired The Howard Federal Savings, FA in Berlin, New Jersey.
1992-11-12 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, National Association, North Jersey in Totowa, New Jersey.
1993-03-18 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, National Association, South Jersey in Burlington Township, New Jersey.
1994-01-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association in Salem, New Jersey.
1994-03-25 Acquired First Peoples National Bank in Edwardsville, Pennsylvania.
1994-10-20 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, National Association in Newark, New Jersey.
1994-11-08 Moved bank headquarters from Salem, New Jersey to Elkton, Maryland.
1994-11-29 Acquired The Bank Of Baltimore in Baltimore, Maryland.
1994-12-30 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, Fsb in Beltsville, Maryland.
1996-01-01 Changed name to First Union National Bank .
1996-07-11 Moved bank headquarters from Elkton, Maryland to Avondale, Pennsylvania.
1998-01-16 Acquired Covenant Bank in Haddonfield, New Jersey.
1998-02-26 Moved bank headquarters from Avondale, Pennsylvania to Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-26 Acquired First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $9,813,776,000
Total deposits: $7,322,665,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

City Federal Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with City Federal Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and City Federal Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-453

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.