City National Bank

Texas – Gregg – Kilgore

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

23261

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23261
FDIC's unique number: 16299
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas

Federal Reserve ID Number: 931654
Report Date: 2007-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16910
The date of the last data update: 2008-02-28

1980-11-03 Institution established. Original name: City National Bank Of Kilgore.
1995-03-08 Reorganized.
1995-07-27 Changed name to City National Bank .
2008-02-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Austin Bank, Texas National Association in Jacksonville, Texas.
2010-10-09 Acquired First State Bank in Frankston, Texas.

Total assets: $191,098,000
Total deposits: $170,922,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

City National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with City National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and City National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-268

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.