City National Bank of North Miami

Florida – Miami-Dade – Miami

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

21617

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21617
FDIC's unique number: 14951
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 106238
Report Date: 1976-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16530
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-18

1974-06-05 Institution established. Original name: City National Bank Of North Miami.
1977-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of City National Bank of Miami in Miami, Florida.
1987-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of City National Bank of Florida in Miami, Florida.

Total assets: $11,868,000
Total deposits: $10,011,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

City National Bank of North Miami does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with City National Bank of North Miami, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and City National Bank of North Miami will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-57

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.