City Savings Bank of Berlin

New Hampshire – Coos – Berlin

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

17251

1901

FDIC Certificate Number: 17251
FDIC's unique number: 11277
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord

Federal Reserve ID Number: 35208
Report Date: 1974-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1901-03-11 Institution established. Original name: City Savings Bank Of Berlin.
1974-04-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Berlin City Bank in Berlin, New Hampshire.
1981-10-01 Acquired Peoples National Bank Of Groveton in Groveton, New Hampshire.
1987-12-31 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
2005-10-01 Changed name to Northway Bank .
2005-10-01 Acquired The Pemigewasset National Bank Of Plymouth in Plymouth, New Hampshire.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

City Savings Bank of Berlin does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with City Savings Bank of Berlin, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and City Savings Bank of Berlin will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-42

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.