Cleveland Federal Bank, a Savings Bank

North Carolina – Cleveland – Shelby

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

30333

1922

FDIC Certificate Number: 30333
FDIC's unique number: 43167
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Charlotte

Federal Reserve ID Number: 121277
Report Date: 1994-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1995-04-13

1922-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Cleveland Federal Savings And Loan Association.
1984-09-30 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1990-07-17 Changed name to Cleveland Federal Bank, A Savings Bank .
1990-07-17 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1995-03-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Centura Bank in Rocky Mount, North Carolina.
1995-06-03 Acquired First Southern Savings Bank, S.s.b in Asheboro, North Carolina.
1996-02-28 Acquired First Commercial Bank in Asheville, North Carolina.
1996-08-19 Acquired First Community Bank in Gastonia, North Carolina.
1996-10-26 Acquired Firstsouth Bank in Burlington, North Carolina.
1998-03-28 Acquired Pee Dee State Bank in Timmonsville, South Carolina.
1999-02-06 Acquired Scotland Savings Bank, SSB in Laurinburg, North Carolina.
1999-03-26 Acquired First Coastal Bank in Virginia Beach, Virginia.
2000-02-19 Acquired Triangle Bank in Raleigh, North Carolina.
2000-02-19 Acquired Bank Of Mecklenburg in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2001-10-30 Changed name to Rbc Centura Bank .
2002-06-01 Acquired Security First Network Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2002-07-22 Acquired Tucker Federal Bank in Tucker, Georgia.
2003-04-26 Acquired Admiralty Bank in Palm Beach Gardens, Florida.
2006-10-12 Moved bank headquarters from Rocky Mount, North Carolina to Raleigh, North Carolina.
2006-12-09 Acquired Flag Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-04-05 Changed name to Rbc Bank .
2008-04-12 Acquired Indian River National Bank in Vero Beach, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Georgia State Bank in Mableton, Georgia.
2008-04-12 Acquired The Peachtree Bank in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-04-12 Acquired Millennium Bank in Gainesville, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Florida Choice Bank in Mount Dora, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Community Bank Of Naples, National Association in Naples, Florida.
2008-04-12 Acquired Cypress Coquina Bank in Ormond Beach, Florida.
2008-06-21 Acquired Alabama Exchange Bank in Tuskegee, Alabama.
2008-06-21 Acquired First American Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.

Total assets: $87,689,000
Total deposits: $74,974,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Cleveland Federal Bank, a Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Cleveland Federal Bank, a Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Cleveland Federal Bank, a Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-247

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.