Commerce Bank of St. Francois County, National Association

Missouri – St. Francois – Farmington

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

20253

1970

FDIC Certificate Number: 20253
FDIC's unique number: 13932
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: St. Louis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 573942
Report Date: 1993-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 20917
The date of the last data update: 1994-03-17

1970-08-31 Institution established. Original name: Commerce Bank Of Bonne Terre.
1970-08-31 Acquired First State Bank Of Bonne Terre in Bonne Terre, Missouri.
1970-08-31 Changed trust powers to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1985-06-07 Changed name to Commerce Bank Of Bonne Terre, National Association .
1986-06-10 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1988-10-11 Changed name to Commerce Bank Of St. Francois County, National Association .
1988-11-01 Moved bank headquarters from Bonne Terre, Missouri to Farmington, Missouri.
1992-05-07 Acquired First Exchange Bank Of Madison County in Fredericktown, Missouri.
1994-03-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce Bank, National Association in Clayton, Missouri.
1995-12-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce Bank, National Association in Clayton, Missouri.
1996-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce Bank, National Association in Clayton, Missouri.
1997-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Commerce Bank, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1998-11-02 Acquired Heritage Bank Of Olathe in Olathe, Kansas.
1999-06-04 Acquired The Citizens National Bank In Independence in Independence, Kansas.
1999-07-08 Acquired The Columbus State Bank in Columbus, Kansas.
1999-08-13 Acquired City National Bank Of Pittsburg in Pittsburg, Kansas.
2001-03-01 Acquired The Centennial Bank in Breckenridge Hills, Missouri.
2004-08-01 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Peoria, Illinois.
2006-09-01 Acquired West Pointe Bank And Trust Company in Belleville, Illinois.
2007-04-01 Acquired Bank South in Tulsa, Oklahoma.
2007-07-02 Acquired Commerce Bank in Aurora, Colorado.
2008-10-01 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Wichita, Kansas.
2008-10-01 Acquired Commerce Bank, National Association in Omaha, Nebraska.
2011-06-29 Changed name to Commerce Bank .
2011-06-29 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2011-06-29 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.

Total assets: $101,350,000
Total deposits: $91,028,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Commerce Bank of St. Francois County, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Commerce Bank of St. Francois County, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Commerce Bank of St. Francois County, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-86

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.