Community First Bank

Oregon – Crook – Prineville

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

23268

1980

FDIC Certificate Number: 23268
FDIC's unique number: 16305
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Portland

Federal Reserve ID Number: 843270
Report Date: 2009-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2009-08-10

1980-12-05 Institution established. Original name: The Prineville Bank.
1981-10-26 Acquired High Lakes Community Bank in La Pine, Oregon.
1997-05-01 Changed name to Community First Bank .
1997-07-17 Reorganized.
2009-08-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Home Federal Bank in Nampa, Idaho.
2009-08-07 FDIC closing information for Community First Bank : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/community-prineville.html.
2011-05-31 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2011-05-31 Changed organization type to Commercial Bank.
2011-05-31 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.

Total assets: $199,508,000
Total deposits: $180,691,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Community First Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Community First Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Community First Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-269

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.