Consumers Savings Bank

Massachusetts – Worcester – Worcester

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

90313

1854

FDIC Certificate Number: 90313
FDIC's unique number: 17902
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma

Federal Reserve ID Number: 669902
Report Date: 1988-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1992-08-20

1854-07-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Worcester Five Cents Savings Bank.
1986-03-06 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1986-03-06 Became FDIC insured.
1988-11-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of New England-Worcester in Worcester, Massachusetts.
1990-02-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of New England, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1990-10-29 Acquired Bank Of New England - West, National Association in Springfield, Massachusetts.
1990-12-31 Acquired Bank Of New England - Old Colony, National Association in Fall River, Massachusetts.
1991-01-06 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New Bank of New England, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1991-07-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet Bank of Massachusetts, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1992-03-27 Acquired Vanguard Savings Bank in Holyoke, Massachusetts.
1992-11-13 Acquired Guaranty-first Trust Company in Waltham, Massachusetts.
1992-12-04 Acquired Heritage Bank For Savings in Holyoke, Massachusetts.
1994-08-15 Acquired Sterling Bank in Waltham, Massachusetts.
1995-01-27 Acquired New Bedford Institution For Savings in New Bedford, Massachusetts.
1996-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Springfield, Massachusetts.
1997-11-14 Moved bank headquarters from Boston, Massachusetts to Providence, Rhode Island.
1997-11-14 Acquired Fleet Bank in Albany, New York.
2000-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-04-03 Acquired Bank Of Boston - Florida, National Association in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-04-03 Acquired Fleet Trust And Investment Services Company, National Association in Stuart, Florida.
2000-04-03 Acquired Fleet Bank, F.S.B. in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-05-01 Acquired Fleet Bank-nh in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $335,164,000
Total deposits: $300,883,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Consumers Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Consumers Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Consumers Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-75

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.