Crestline Building and Loan Association

Ohio – Crawford – Crestline

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29768

1891

FDIC Certificate Number: 29768
FDIC's unique number: 42602
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 599577
Report Date: 1992-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1992-12-04

1891-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Crestline Building And Loan Association.
1987-10-31 Changed organization type to Stock Savings & Loan.
1992-11-20 Failed, went into receivership, and then became The Crestline Federal Savings and Loan Association in Crestline, Ohio.
1993-07-30 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of PremierBank & Trust in Elyria, Ohio.
1996-11-04 Moved bank headquarters from Crestline, Ohio to Elyria, Ohio.
1998-05-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Firstmerit Bank, National Association in Akron, Ohio.
1998-10-23 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland in Mayfield Heights, Ohio.
1998-10-23 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Kent in Kent, Ohio.
1999-02-12 Acquired Nc Interim National Bank in New Castle, Pennsylvania.
1999-02-12 Acquired Signal Bank, National Association in Wooster, Ohio.
1999-02-12 Acquired Summit Bank, National Association in Fairlawn, Ohio.
2010-02-19 Acquired George Washington Savings Bank in Orland Park, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-14 Acquired Midwest Bank And Trust Company in Elmwood Park, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $27,455,000
Total deposits: $26,775,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Crestline Building and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Crestline Building and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Crestline Building and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-94

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.